WORCESTER AREA GROUP U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of educational, social and recreational activities in and around Worcester for retired people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 February 1990: Standard registration
- U3AWAG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurence Wale | Chair | 17 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Ann Patterson | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Wilson | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Davis | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ferne Catherine Langdon | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Stephen Thorneycroft | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Beryl Frances Curtis | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Currie | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Virginia Lucas | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Robb | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Ditchburn | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.44k | £28.05k | £47.26k | £63.48k | £53.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.19k | £22.57k | £48.21k | £65.31k | £56.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/11/1989 AS AMENDED ON 11/09/1991 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 20 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED ON 14 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
WORCESTER AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Lion Court
WORCESTER
WR1 1UT
- Phone:
- 07753746092
- Email:
- chair@worcesteru3a.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window