MEANWOOD CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We raise cash to help the school in the education of our children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £11,441
Total expenditure: £8,407

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Dean Chair 01 September 2023
None on record
Emily Clare Drake Trustee 31 October 2024
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Walker Trustee 30 September 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.02k £2.56k £10.25k £11.83k £11.44k
Total expenditure £5.02k £2.74k £7.85k £13.89k £8.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 12 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 June 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MEANWOOD C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
GREEN ROAD
LEEDS
LS6 4LD
Phone:
01132755883
Website:

No information available