THE ARNSIDE/SILVERDALE AONB LANDSCAPE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To work for the public benefit in creating environmental awareness and in stimulation and encouraging an understanding of and active involvement in the protection, conservation, and practical improvement of features of general and public amenity or historical interest within the landscape,and in doing so provides grants to assist in the process.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,790 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 16 March 1990: Standard registration
- ARNSIDE/SILVERDALE AONB LANDSCAPE TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN BENNER | Chair | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Basil Justin Bromley Wetters | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
FIONA AGNES ALLAN | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Lindsay | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Graham Blease | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Farrell | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROGER NEEDHAM CARTWRIGHT | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY MARSH | Trustee | 04 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL ROBERT WARREN | Trustee | 03 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.82k | £99.54k | £30.63k | £48.00k | £22.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.13k | £13.64k | £51.02k | £28.54k | £13.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.87k | £1.40k | £1.43k | £23.29k | £1.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 1989 as amended on 14 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF BOTH RESIDENTS AND VISITORS WITHIN THE ARNSIDE/SILVERDALE AREA OF OUTSTANDING NATURAL BEAUTY BY STIMULATING AND ENCOURAGING BOTH UNDERSTANDING OF AND ACTIVE INVOLVEMENT IN THE PROTECTION, CONSERVATION AND PRACTICAL IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORICAL INTEREST WITHIN THE LANDSCAPE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD STATION BUILDING
ARNSIDE
CARNFORTH
LANCS
LA5 0HG
- Phone:
- 01524761034
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window