Trustees THE ARNSIDE/SILVERDALE AONB LANDSCAPE TRUST

Charity number: 702624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN BENNER Chair 08 June 2018
None on record
Basil Justin Bromley Wetters Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
FIONA AGNES ALLAN Trustee 19 July 2024
None on record
Nicholas Lindsay Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Trevor Graham Blease Trustee 20 July 2022
None on record
Lynne Farrell Trustee 20 July 2022
None on record
ROGER NEEDHAM CARTWRIGHT Trustee 08 June 2018
None on record
GARY MARSH Trustee 04 June 2012
None on record
Dr MICHAEL ROBERT WARREN Trustee 03 August 2011
None on record