MAXELL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAXELL EDUCATIONAL TRUST The Trust was set up in 1989 by Maxell Europe Ltd to express the Company appreciation for the support it had received from the local community. A sum of £300,000 was invested which generates income for the trust, subject to fund availability, the trustees grant awards within the Telford and Wrekin area on a regular basis subject to its policy and award criteria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 07 March 1990: Standard registration
- 09 November 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 December 2011: Re-registered
- MAXELL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE LOWE | Chair | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Barlow Chapman | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Davies | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Baker MBE | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN JAMIESON | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Camm | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.23k | £5.57k | £4.50k | £4.08k | £5.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £586 | £22.43k | £25.86k | £21.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL GRANTS TO STUDENTS ATTENDING SCHOOLS OR COLLEGES WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE TOWN OF TELFORD OR WHOSE FAMILY HOME IS WHTHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE TOWN OF TELFORD. (2) THE FURTHERANCE OF RESEARCH PROJECTS IN ELECTRONICS AND TECHNOLOGY BY TEACHERS WORKING WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE TOWN OF TELFORD AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 3) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INGABITANTS OF TOWN OF TELFORD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE TOWN OF TELFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maxell
Oaktree Place
Hortonwood 35
Telford
TF1 7FR
- Phone:
- 01952522207
- Email:
- hr@maxell.eu
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window