BIRMINGHAM MENTAL HEALTH LEISURE FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leisure forum provides social, recreational and sporting opportunities to those with experience of mental health problems across the city of Birmingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 14 March 1990: Standard registration
- 14 September 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- LEISURE FORUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.62k | £24.57k | £30.30k | £14.29k | £8.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.44k | £19.58k | £29.75k | £20.60k | £12.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £13.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.62k | £13.30k | £13.30k | £13.31k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 10 February 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 01 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 01 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 09 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
TO USE THE INCOME FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BIRMINGHAM WHO SUFFER FROM MENTAL ILLNESS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window