Trustees GRANGE OVER SANDS LECTURE SOCIETY
Charity number: 702671

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Stephen Helliwell | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Theodore Scott-Clarke | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Wood | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Hinchcliffe | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Haydn Cook | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ratcliffe | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Douglas Kimber | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Skelton | Trustee | 26 February 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.