Financial history HOUGHTON ON THE HILL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.58k £2.16k £10.84k £8.00k £5.31k
Total expenditure £8.71k £840 £10.09k £11.28k £2.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A