HOUGHTON ON THE HILL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (PTA) FOR LOCAL SCHOOL. TO SUPPORT HOUGHTON ON THE HILL CE PRIMARY SCHOOL BY RAISING MONEY TO ENHANCE LEARNING AND PURCHASE EQUIPMENT AND RESOURCES FOR THE CHILDREN AND TEACHERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 20 March 1990: Standard registration
- 09 January 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 March 2012: Re-registered
- SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Howard | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PRICE | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.58k | £2.16k | £10.84k | £8.00k | £5.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.71k | £840 | £10.09k | £11.28k | £2.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 SEPTEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED 11 SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL: (A) DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT, (C) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
33A MAIN STREET
HOUGHTON-ON-THE-HILL
LEICESTER
LE7 9GE
- Phone:
- 01162434595
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window