ASTON SPRINGWOOD HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of out of school activities for children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Total income includes £98,402 from government contract(s) and £5,847 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rotherham
Governance
- 21 March 1990: Standard registration
- 09 February 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.67k | £147.74k | £158.24k | £150.83k | £172.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.98k | £137.56k | £136.12k | £140.87k | £145.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £96.26k | £96.77k | £98.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £5.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 09 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 09 May 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JANUARY 1990 AS AMENDED 6 MARCH 1990 AND 07 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY:-A) DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL.B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.C) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window