Accounts and annual returns RHYL ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702705
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 June 2015 10 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 June 2015 Not Required
Annual return 14 April 2014 12 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 14 April 2013 02 March 2014 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 14 April 2012 29 January 2014 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2012 Not Required