Financial history LIFE EDUCATION (BRADFORD) LIMITED

Charity number: 702709
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100.41k £111.08k £119.60k £123.08k £128.57k
Total expenditure £103.76k £103.00k £100.77k £119.40k £138.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £38.43k £2.00k N/A N/A