ANIMAL AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NOW TRADING UNDER CHARITY No. 1143133. Prevent cruelty and relieve the suffering of and distress of animals in need of care and attention in the Merseyside area. The charity provides shelter for stray/unwanted dogs & cats and find loving, secure homes for all the animals in its care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 23 March 1990: Standard registration
- 15 June 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 June 2017: Funds transferred to 1143133 ANIMAL AID 246
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.91k | £4.12k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.02k | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 31 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 March 2015 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT CRUELTY AND RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN THE MERSEYSIDE AREA.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window