SEFTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sefton WI is an organisation for women in the North Liverpool area who are interested in issues relevant to rural and town life. Our aim is to give like minded women the opportunity to work together in order to support other local organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Sefton
Governance
- 09 April 1990: Standard registration
- 06 May 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.52k | £3.18k | £110 | £4.37k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.12k | £2.96k | £505 | £3.29k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 24 March 2022 | 570 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OR THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE.
Area of benefit
SEFTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window