Trustees U3A CHEPSTOW GROUP
Charity number: 702771

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Helen Harkins | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lewis | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Alice Davies | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Celia Parkhouse | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tony Patrick Wilson | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Shottin | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Maurice Marshall | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Daphne Le Fevre | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Davies | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Channing | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jane Harrison | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.