Financial history RUPERT BROOKE LITERARY PRIZE FUND

Charity number: 702782
Charity reporting is overdue by 1001 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £20 £20 £2 £2 £4.82k
Total expenditure £420 £500 £320 £240 £240
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A