Financial history DAUBHILL MUSLIM SOCIETY

Charity Number: 702789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £549.48k £531.37k £580.40k £616.75k £760.53k
Total expenditure £471.49k £471.80k £467.81k £480.82k £534.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £336.32k £343.00k £339.41k £345.93k £400.10k
Income - Donations and legacies £49.29k £0 £580.40k £616.75k £760.53k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £500.19k £531.37k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £432.67k £471.80k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £467.81k £480.82k £534.81k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £38.83k £0 £0 £0 £0