Governing document DAUBHILL MUSLIM SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 APRIL 1985 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 1990, 31 MAY 1996, 23 FEBRUARY 1997, 17 MAY 1998 AND 9 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED 14 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
(3) THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE, WITHIN THE AREA OF DAUBHILL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF: TO ESTABLISH A MOSQUE AND SUCH ANCILLARY BUILDINGS AS THOUGHT NECESSARY AND MANAGE THE SAME FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE SOCIETY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS: TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SUNNI, HANAFI AND DEOBANDI ETHOS AND TABLIGH PRINCIPLE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIM CHILDREN: TO RELIEVE MUSLIMS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, AND TO PROVIDE, ORGANISE AND MANAGE SUPPORT FACILITIES, I.E. THROUGH MANAGEMENT OF COMMUNITY CENTRE ETC: TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS GENERALLY AND PARTICULARLY BETWEEN RACIAL GROUPS PROFESSING THE MUSLIM FAITH AND ALL OTHER INHABITANTS OF THE SAID AREA.
Area of benefit
DAUBHILL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.