CHESTER MUSIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 702792
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 18 April 1990: Standard registration
- 10 May 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 10 May 2004: Funds transferred to 1099094 CHESTER MUSIC SOCIETY
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCTOBER 1945 AS AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 1984, 25 SEPTEMBER 1985, 27 NOVEMBER 1989 AND 1 DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY FURTHERING THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.