NEWGROUND TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In June 2013 the charity became a member of the Together Housing Group and amended its objects as follows to reflect this new position in the North of England: 1. Conservation of the natural environment 2. Urban and rural regeneration 3. Provision of Recreation and Leisure with the aim of improving conditions of life 4. Advance the life chances of young people 5. Advance education and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,230,669
Donations and legacies | £840.22k | |
Charitable activities | £2.41m | |
Other trading activities | £2.91m | |
Investments | £67.44k | |
Other | £5.24k |
Total expenditure:
£5,748,573
Raising funds | £2.35m | |
Charitable activities | £3.40m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £87,320 from 1 government contract(s) and £426,347 from 11 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.35m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.40m | |
Retained for future use | £482.10k |
People

112 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- North Yorkshire
- Salford City
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 06 July 1990: Standard registration
- BLACKBURN GROUNDWORK TRUST (Previous name)
- GROUNDWORK BLACKBURN (Previous name)
- GROUNDWORK PENNINE LANCASHIRE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Gore | Chair | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Steve Michael Duncan | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lesley Burrows | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Davies | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Hague | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Zaffer Khan | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Gwynne Furlong | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.17m | £11.20m | £5.47m | £5.63m | £6.23m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.38m | £10.89m | £5.03m | £5.58m | £5.75m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £91.73k | £87.32k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £240.36k | £426.35k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £200.00k | £428.04k | £317.70k | £463.55k | £840.22k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £7.12m | £9.64m | £2.94m | £2.66m | £2.91m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £842.00k | £949.74k | £2.13m | £2.48m | £2.41m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.30k | £732 | £400 | £17.50k | £67.44k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £178.08k | £75.94k | £5.24k | £5.24k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.64m | £1.74m | £2.83m | £3.39m | £3.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.35m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £135.03k | £124.05k | £25.17k | £27.17k | £28.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £82.01k | £0 | £69.22k | £265.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £6.74m | £9.15m | £2.20m | £2.20m | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £330.65k | £288.79k | £196.93k | £162.52k | £212.01k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.32m | £4.30m | £5.20m | £5.10m | £5.53m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.76m | £2.39m | £2.75m | £2.55m | £2.55m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/05/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/05/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/07/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 JUN 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT ANYWHERE IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND. (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION ANYWHERE IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; (E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; (F) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (G) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; (H) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH, WELFARE AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR PERSONS LIVING WITHIN THOSE AREAS; AND (I) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION. (3) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR INDIVIDUALS IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (4) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (5) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING TRAINING) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE NORTH OF ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Together Housing
Prospect House
Wharf Street
BLACKBURN
BB1 1JD
- Phone:
- 01254 265163
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window