REDCAR EAST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charitable organization that provides activities and accommodation for members and other groups. We have Play Group, Keep Fit, Tai Chi, Dance, Camera club, Yoga, Sewing and Craft,Coffee morning, Philately, W.I., Art classes, Visual presentations, Keyboard, Zumba, Performing Arts, Parchment Class and Religious Groups meetings and services as part of our available activities in the Redcar area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 25 April 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY CLOSE | Chair |
|
||||||
Simon Unwin | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Unwin | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN NIGHTINGALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.20k | £18.22k | £11.67k | £9.05k | £8.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.99k | £19.72k | £6.83k | £5.93k | £9.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.30k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WHO RESIDE WITHIN REDCAR BOUNDRIES AS FOLLOWS: ON THE EAST BY GREEN LANE, ON THE SOUTH BY REDCAR BOUNDRY, ON THE WEST BY KIRKLEATHAM LANE (INCLUDING DORMANSTOWN) ON THE NORTH BY ESPLANADE AND COAST ROAD, AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.2)TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
REDCAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 WINCHESTER ROAD
REDCAR
TS10 3QW
- Phone:
- 01642476960
- Email:
- REDCARGEOFF@gmail.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window