Financial history CELLAN VILLAGE IMPROVEMENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 702831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.58k £2.37k £438 £2.24k £6.56k
Total expenditure £10.16k £3.58k £1.91k £6.63k £7.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A