Financial history PETS IN NEED (P I N )

Charity Number: 702862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £52.92k £87.22k £110.44k £40.45k £41.21k
Total expenditure £45.92k £41.09k £38.71k £69.90k £29.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.80k £27.00k N/A N/A N/A