Accounts and annual returns SUNDERLAND VOLUNTEER BUREAU

Charity number: 702873
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 11 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 12 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 28 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 23 June 2014 143 days late
Annual return 31 March 2012 12 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 17 December 2012 On Time