SUNDERLAND VOLUNTEER BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Provide support at a local level for volunteers and volunteer involving organisations. To break down barriers to volunteering, To match individuals/groups interested in volunteering with appropriate opportunities in the community. Marketing volunteering, Good practice development, Developing volunteering opportunities, Policy response and campaigning Strategic development of volunteering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sunderland
Governance
- 16 May 1990: Standard registration
- 27 May 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 27 May 2015: Funds transferred to 1160544 VOLUNTEER CENTRE SUNDERLAND
- VOLUNTEER CENTRE SUNDERLAND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.72k | £160.41k | £189.92k | £189.92k | £119.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.00k | £161.32k | £202.66k | £202.66k | £163.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 11 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 12 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 28 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 23 June 2014 | 143 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 12 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 17 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADPTED 16 FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICES, AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AMONGST THOSE CLASSES IN NEED THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window