21ST WARRINGTON WEST (1ST APPLETON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE GROUP OPERATES BEAVER, CUB AND SCOUT SECTIONS, FOR YOUNG CHILDREN AGED 6 TO 14 YEARS, OFFERING WIDE RANGE OF INDOOR AND OUTDOOR BASED ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warrington
Governance
- 16 May 1990: Standard registration
- 1ST APPLETON SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 21ST WARRINGTON (1ST APPLETON) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles David Tilston Mitchell | Chair | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Paginton | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Lara Gray Macdonald | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Jocelyn Green | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie King | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon O'Hara | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CAREY | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Stephen Cummings | Trustee | 06 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.03k | £28.19k | £46.77k | £64.06k | £40.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.42k | £17.44k | £38.49k | £58.11k | £60.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.34k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/1949 AS AMENDED ON 18/02/1959 AS AMENDED ON 05/05/1967 AS AMENDED ON 19/07/1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21st Warrington West Scout Hall
Dudlow Green Road
Appleton
WARRINGTON
WA4 5EQ
- Phone:
- 07581273083
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window