DUFTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 702887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As a management committee our function is to maintain and manage the Dufton Village Hall as a resource for the villagers of Dufton and environs. In order to be able to maintain the hall, we also are involved in organising social events with the purpose of raising funds to maintain the hall.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £17,987
Total expenditure: £14,885

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Gorman Quarmby Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Peter Gerald King Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
David Carter Trustee 01 October 2016
ULLSWATER COMMUNITY COLLEGE SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
MR Simon Higginbothom Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
WENDY MARY SWINBANK Trustee
KIRKBY STEPHEN APPLEBY AND TEBAY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: 1 day late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £21.47k £31.91k £21.14k £16.38k £17.99k
Total expenditure £16.00k £8.58k £39.09k £9.86k £14.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.07k £12.60k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 26 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 26 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HALL CROFT
DUFTON
APPLEBY-IN-WESTMORLAND
CA16 6DB
Phone:
01768352167