Financial history ASHIANA HOUSING ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 702905
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £4.21m £4.25m £3.96m £4.48m £5.18m
Total expenditure £4.22m £4.01m £4.04m £4.47m £4.77m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £3.96m £4.33m £5.15m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £104.13k £145.18k £28.38k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £4.02m £4.47m £4.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £25.53k £8.06k £8.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0