Governing document ASHIANA HOUSING ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 DECEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 8 MAY 1990 15 FEBRUARY 2006 14 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND AMENDED ON 1 SEPTEMBER 1994 BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE MEMBERS OF THE ASIAN COMMUNITY IN ROCHDALE AND ITS ENVIRONS WHO ARE SUFFERING POVERTY OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF POOR HOUSING CONDITIONS AND TO CARRY OUT ANY OTHER ACTIVITY WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CARRIED OUT BY A REGISTERED CHARITY WHICH IS REGISTERED AS A SOCIAL LANDLORD WITH THE HOUSING CORPORATION..
Area of benefit
ROCHDALE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.