DADLINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Dadlington Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 22 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clair Bowen | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Buckby | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bowen | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Reid | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Reid | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Giles Setchell | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenis Kitely | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA JOHNSON | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ANNE JOAN REES-JONES | Trustee | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP KITELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Simon Rees-Jones | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.08k | £6.61k | £5.01k | £8.84k | £9.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.81k | £4.63k | £2.51k | £6.13k | £7.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 02 September 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 19 FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF DADLINGTON AND STOKE GOLDING WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
DADLINGTON AND STOKE GOLDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
HIGH STREET
STOKE GOLDING
NUNEATON
CV13 6HE
- Phone:
- 01455213988
- Email:
- dvhmc2015@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window