THEM WIFIES LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to use creativity and the arts to work with people who face disadvantage and barriers and to develop tailor made specialist services and resources that deliver innovative and positive experiences. We currently deliver work to women and men with learning disabilities; vulnerable young women and also young people with mental health issues, in community and educational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £8,174 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Sunderland
Governance
- 24 May 1990: Standard registration
- 16 March 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221.95k | £185.70k | £300.25k | £188.41k | £222.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.58k | £206.73k | £212.51k | £270.36k | £256.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 08 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 08 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 26 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 18 August 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 11 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 30 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 16 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 03 September 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF COMMUNITY ARTS AND RECREATION WITHIN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND GATESHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREAS, AND TO ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR (B) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS FOR WHOM SUCH FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED BEING PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE FOR CONTINUTION OF OBJECTS SEE OVERLEAF
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE GATESHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window