THE RUBY JAMES PRIZE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Educational Awards in recognition of achievements
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Merthyr Tydfil
Governance
- 24 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVE JONES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £22 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £25 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 MAY 1990
Charitable objects
THE INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FIRST IN DEFRAYING THE EXPENSES (IF ANY) OF THE MANAGEMENT OF THE TRUST FUND AND THEN IN PROVIDING TWO ANNUAL PRIZES EACH TO BE KNOWN AS THE "RUBY JAMES PRIZE" TO BE AWARDED TO ONE BOY AND ONE GIRL WHO HAVE COMPLETED AT LEAST THEIR FIRST YEAR & NOT MORE THAN THEIR SECOND YEAR AT THE CYFARTHFA HIGH SCHOOL (OR SUCH OTHER SCHOOL WHETHER ESTABLISHED AT THE PRESENT PREMISES OR ELSEWHERE AND WHETHER CALLED CYFARTHFA HIGH SCHOOL OR OTHERWISE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DATED 9 MAY 1990)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merthyr Tydfil County Borough
Council
Civic Centre
MERTHYR TYDFIL
CF478AN
- Phone:
- 01685 725000
- Email:
- ian.kent@merthyr.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window