LEASOWE PLAY YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LPYCA currently operates a Community Centre; Youth sessions one night per week; An Adventure Playground; There is a Luncheon Club for the over 55's which operates 3 days per week; The Community Centre is open Monday to Friday each week. There is now a Community Supermarket based within the community centre which is open to local residents and other people to use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,554 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wirral
Governance
- 24 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anita Leech | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Jones | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christina Amis | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WILLIAM TOWNLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.48k | £27.55k | £74.57k | £70.06k | £69.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.95k | £27.48k | £40.13k | £63.69k | £70.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.27k | £17.15k | N/A | N/A | £11.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED 28 NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
-A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEASOWE & THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS & INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION & TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND & COMMUNITY COMPLEX (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE PLAYGROUND" OR "THE COMPLEX") & TO MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE & MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A "PLAYGROUND" AND "COMPEX" FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LEASOWE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Warwick Road
Upton
WIRRAL
CH49 6NE
- Phone:
- 07521399000
- Email:
- pw.townley@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window