SHREWSBURY MUSIC THERAPY UNIT TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THSE FAMILIES UNABLE TO FINANCE THE THERAPY REQUIRED AND RECOMMENDED BY DOCTORS AND SOCIAL SERVICES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 31 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHIRLEY CAROLE ROBERTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Jane Cartwright | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elaine Burns | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE JONES | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALAN LEWIS EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.91k | £7.45k | £4.94k | £10.58k | £7.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.80k | £5.26k | £9.78k | £10.00k | £10.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 APRIL 1990 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION 29 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ASSIST IN THE REMEDIAL TREATMENT OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL EMOTIONAL PSYCHOLOGICAL OR OTHER MENTAL DISORDERS BY THE PROVISION OF MUSIC THERAPY TREATMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH ACCEPTED PRACTICES WITHIN THE FIELD OF MUSIC THERAPY. THE FUND SHALL BE APPLIED PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF SHROPSHIRE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Drovers Way
Newport
TF10 7XN
- Phone:
- 01952811598
- Email:
- sjones303@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window