Financial history BILTON GRANGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.35k £5.56k £16.21k £14.78k £16.96k
Total expenditure £21.24k £15.89k £17.74k £14.57k £17.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A