FEATHERED FRIENDS - WILD BIRD RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advise on care of sick or injured native birds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 08 June 1990: Standard registration
- 09 February 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- WILD BIRD RESCUE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £640 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 18 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 28 July 2017 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 1990
Charitable objects
A) THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY OT WILD BIRDS B) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF WILD BIRDS WHO ARE SICK INJURED OR DISEASED AND IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION. C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE SUTDY AND PROTECTION OF WILD BIRDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window