THE ENDOWMENT FUND FOR THE SCHOOL AT PRESCOT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial assistance for pupils who have attended or still attend the school at Prescot by awarding travel scholarships etc. or helping to pay for extra courses, outfits, tools, instruments or books they may need to further their education Grants for Educational Equipment not provided by the local authority Upkeep, repairs and improvements to the Outdoor Education facility at Tan y Graig
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Knowsley
Governance
- 10 July 1990: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 May 2010: Standard registration
- THE PRESCOT SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOWARD NULTY | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Ford | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Elizabeth Birchall-Jones | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Matthew Christopher Reynolds | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Kimberley Mannings | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Mark McClure | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
William Robert Draper Hughes | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Elspeth Ave Graham | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Romney Yeoman Walker | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Sills | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tom Mc Hale | Trustee | 17 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
MARK SALMON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.21k | £20.47k | £20.88k | £21.82k | £5.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.90k | £10.27k | £21.08k | £19.26k | £1.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2023 | 332 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2023 | 697 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2023 | 1062 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 07/11/1989 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05/12/2011
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE FOR THE PRESCOT SCHOOL (OR OTHER SUCH REORGANISED SCHOOL AT PRESCOT AS MAY REPLACE THE SAID SCHOOL) SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE GOVERNORS OF THE FOUNDATION AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE 25 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND EITHER WHO ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS AT ANY TIME ATTENDED PRESCOT SCHOOL OR PRESCOT GIRLS GRAMMAR SCHOOL (OR SUCH OTHER REORGANISED SCHOOLS AT PRESCOT AS HAVE REPLACED OR MAY PLACE THE SAID SCHOOLS) OR WHO (IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME IS NOT REPLACED FOR SUCH PERSONS ATTENDING OF HAVING ATTENDED AS AFORESAID) ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF PRESCOT, IN ONE OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE GOVERNORS THINK FIT: 1) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE GOVERNORS 2) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Forest Farm
Liverpool Road
PRESCOT
Merseyside
L34 1NR
- Phone:
- 07786 073 355
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window