Accounts and annual returns THE DERBY SOFT PLAY PROJECT

Charity number: 703084
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 05 March 2010 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 14 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 27 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 29 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 June 2006 On Time