THE DERBY SOFT PLAY PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Softplay for Children aged between 0-5 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 16 July 1990: Standard registration
- 23 September 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MICKLEOVER PLAY PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.84k | £21.62k | £15.72k | £12.73k | £10.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.55k | £22.96k | £17.82k | £11.81k | £10.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 05 March 2010 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 14 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 27 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 29 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 28 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 23 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 29 June 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUNE 1990 AS AMENDED 7 MAY 1991 AND 1 MAY 1998.
Charitable objects
A) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND WELFARE OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR THE UNDER FIVES AND THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND THEIR CARERS. B) ENCOURAGE CREATIVE PLAY AND SELF HELP. C) PROVIDE THE MEANS WHEREBY PLAY CAN BE SAFE AND SATISFYING. D) ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE RELEVANT CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS CAN HELP THEIR CHILDREN. E) PROMOTE ACTIVITIES RELEVANT TO THE PRESENTATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH. F) FOSTER GOOD COMMUNITY RELATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window