COVENTRY RACIAL EQUALITY COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 04 July 1990: Standard registration
- 20 January 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COVENTRY COMMUNITY RELATIONS COUNCIL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 13 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 03 September 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 03 September 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 4 JANUARY 1990 AND 2 JULY 1992.
Charitable objects
1. TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION AND 2. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS: ESPECIALLY IN THE CITY OF COVENTRY HEREINAFTER KNOWN AS THE "AREA OF BENEFIT".
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window