THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BRECON HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To collect and administer funds from street collections, public fairs, funeral donations, legacies and contributions and run fund raising public events. To apply income and capital to improve facilities and services of Brecon Hospital for the benefit of patients, former patients, staff and visitors where not provided by LHB/NHS.To provide these benefits to other activities assisting patients
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Powys
Governance
- 09 July 1990: Standard registration
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BRECON HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GILLIAN TODD | Chair | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Sandra Jones Morgan | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Russell Stafford-Tolley | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
THE HON ELIZABETH SHAN JOSEPHINE LEGGE BOURKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.29k | £19.77k | £19.47k | £22.48k | £28.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.07k | £14.44k | £17.11k | £267.88k | £26.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 15 MAY 1990 AND 16 MAY 2001. AS AMENDED 26 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE BRECON HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cilgarenydd
Pontfaen
BRECON
Powys
LD3 9ND
- Phone:
- 01874690369
- Email:
- rst.brecon@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window