ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF WILLIAM SHREWSBURY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund-raising for School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 09 July 1990: Standard registration
- A F W S (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Lewis | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Redding | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.62k | £6.44k | £26.01k | £26.01k | £35.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.99k | £17.40k | £14.83k | £14.83k | £42.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 July 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 September 2023 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED 21ST MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY;-(A) DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL.(B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. (C) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILLIAM SHREWSBURY PRIMARY SCHOOL
CHURCH ROAD
STRETTON
BURTON ON TRENT
DE13 0HE
- Phone:
- 01283 247490
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window