Financial history BOURNE OUTDOOR SWIMMING POOL PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 703108
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2008 31/10/2009 31/10/2010 31/10/2011 01/05/2013
Total gross income £41 £56.98k £55.08k £54.90k £75.53k
Total expenditure £49 £61.54k £51.45k £55.82k £83.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A