FRIENDS OF NEVILL ROAD SCHOOLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity holds fund raising events and raises funds for equipment or materials which improve the education and experience of the children at Nevill Road Infant and Junior Schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Stockport
Governance
- 19 July 1990: Standard registration
- NEVILL ROAD HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- NEVILLE ROAD HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Perez-Merino | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Pelleschi | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.55k | £19.25k | £21.74k | £17.76k | £16.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.86k | £17.60k | £18.11k | £28.28k | £12.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED 31 JANUARY 1990, 21 JANUARY 1998, 20 JANUARY 1999 AND 17 JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nevill Road Infant School
Nevill Road
Bramhall
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK7 3ET
- Phone:
- 01614394817
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window