CUMBRIAN SOCIETY OF ORGANISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of awareness, skill and enjoyment in all aspects of the classical organ and organ music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 20 July 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Alexander Town | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Donaldson | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Horsley | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE HARRISON | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SHINGLER | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Samuel Alastair Carradice | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Geoffrey Self | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47k | £631 | £1.26k | £1.48k | £1.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.29k | £530 | £1.26k | £1.34k | £1.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 1987 AS AMENDED 14 MAY 1988, 24 MAY 1989, 17 MAY 1990 AND 17 MAY 1995 as amended on 27 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY A) THE PROMOTION, PERFORMANCE AND APPRECIATION OF ORGAN MUSIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO ITS USE IN CHURCH. B) THE PROMOTION OF INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ORGAN IE DESIGN, BUILDING AND HISTORY. C) THE PROMOTION OF THE CLOSEST CO-OPERATION WITH CHURCH AUTHORITIES IN THE USE OF MUSIC IN WORSHIP. D) THE PROMOTION OF INTEREST BY YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 SYKE ROAD
WIGTON
CA7 9LX
- Phone:
- 019467 28179
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window