SHEFFIELD U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Self help group providing social, educational, recreational and sporting activities for members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
210 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 20 July 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David James Longson | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jocelynne Beadle-Bell | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Anne Taylor | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Brian James Barrett | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Clare Chiba | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Powell-Wiffen | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Terence Leslie Baker | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN CAVE | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Elaine Burtoft | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.42k | £39.78k | £34.88k | £104.00k | £114.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.93k | £31.15k | £26.07k | £105.90k | £107.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 24 JANUARY 1996 AND 5 MARCH 1997 AND 11TH OF APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED ON 18 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 09 JUL 2019 as amended on 30 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
The advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development, in Sheffield and its surrounding locality
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Burlington Grove
SHEFFIELD
S17 3PH
- Phone:
- 07847 383636
- Email:
- treasurer@su3a.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window