SCARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT DISABLEMENT ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scarborough DAG is run by disabled people for disabled people, carers and those with an interest in disability. The group offers a comprehensive information and advice service covering benefits, access, discrimination, employment, holidays, leisure etc. The service is provided for people who live in the area of Scarborough and District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 July 1990: Standard registration
- D A G (Working name)
- SCARBOROUGH & DISTRICT DAG (Working name)
- THE DISABLEMENT ACTION GROUP SCARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN WHITFIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Caroline Hill | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Bramham | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Helen Lees | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mort | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Holly Bennett | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MARR | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laurena Brumpton | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.88k | £29.19k | £56.22k | £82.31k | £54.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.52k | £40.28k | £53.67k | £63.05k | £61.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 5 APRIL 1990 AS AMENDED ON 9 FEBRUARY 1995.
Charitable objects
(A) TO BENEFIT THOSE PERSONS IN THE SCARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT AREA WHO ARE SUBSTANTIALLY AND OR PERMANENTLY DISABLED BY PROVIDING, OR ENCOURAGING THE PROVISION OF SERVICES WHICH FACILITATE INDEPENDENCE IN DAILY LIVING ACTIVITIES ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN AND FULL INTEGRAION INTO SOCIETY. (B) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ALL DISABLED PERSONS WITHIN THE AREA BENEFIT AND TO ASSIST THOSE PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF A DIRECT INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICE.
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 4
THE STREET
12 LOWER CLARK STREET
SCARBOROUGH
NORTH YORKSHIRE
YO12 7PW
- Phone:
- 01723480029
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window