WILLIAM GILBERT PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PTA raising funds for the benefit of the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 30 July 1990: Standard registration
- WILLIAM GILBERT SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Jane Macdonald | Chair | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ruth Spencer | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Longmore | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.61k | £25.69k | £4.95k | £5.15k | £11.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.50k | £14.00k | £14.08k | £7.82k | £8.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 18 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 6 JUNE 1990 REVISED 22/03/06 as amended on 09 Mar 2017 as amended on 09 Apr 2018 as amended on 20 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF WILLIAM GILBERT ENDOWED (AIDED) PRIMARY SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL AND 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
William Gilbert Endowed School
Vicarage Lane
Duffield
BELPER
Derbyshire
DE56 4EB
- Phone:
- 01332 840395
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window