Accounts and annual returns EGGLESCLIFFE VILLAGE WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 703181
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2008 16 January 2009 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2007 05 September 2008 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2006 13 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2005 14 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 Not Required