Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE KNOWLES FOSTER HOMES
Charity Number: 212450-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 11 MAR 2009
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 AUG 2021
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07 JUL 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE PROVISION OF HOUSING OR MAINTENANCE FOR PEOPLE HAVING INSUFFICIENT INCOME TO LIVE IN REASONABLE COMFORT WITHOUT FINANCIAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
- 14 May 1963: Standard registration
- 07 July 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 07 July 2022: Funds transferred to 212450 THE NATIONAL BENEVOLENT CHARITY
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.